U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buckelew
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice-other]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.