U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stewart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Document]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Document]
  • May 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.