U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 06, 2023: [2255 Letter]
  • January 06, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Vacate (2255) ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • September 13, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Vacate ]
  • April 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 21, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • March 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 08, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 30, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • November 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.