U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Document]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Document]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 24, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.