U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNeil
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.