U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pittman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • March 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.