U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miranda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferral of Prosecution]
  • August 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 06, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.