U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gyasi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • February 16, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.