U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mulkey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.