U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Prob12A - Order on Report on Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Prob49 - Waiver of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • February 16, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.