U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navarro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Dismiss ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • June 14, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.