U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:04-cr-00008-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOYD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Judgment 2255]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 19, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • August 04, 2021: [Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • July 14, 2021: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2021: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Produce ]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Produce ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • February 16, 2021: [Produce ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.