U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simpson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 05, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • February 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • February 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.