U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orellana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferral of Prosecution]
  • May 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 19, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.