U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 05, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • May 05, 2022: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 15, 2022: [Seal]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2021: [Bill of Particulars]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • March 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.