U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robledo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss ]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.