U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 09, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.