U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Massey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Service by Publication]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • April 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • April 19, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.