U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue Other]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue Other]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 31, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 25, 2021: [Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 25, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.