U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heatherly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 29, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 29, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 29, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 27, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 27, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.