U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Service by Publication]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 03, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 03, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.