U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Faulk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Service by Publication]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • July 07, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2021: [Factual Basis]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 17, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 25, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.