U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weiss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Service by Publication]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 26, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 30, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.