U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.