U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara-Zuniga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 23, 2022: [Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 06, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.