U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BATTERMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 15, 2021: [Oral Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Rule 32.1 Documents Received]
  • August 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • February 17, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.