U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mobley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.