U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lanning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 09, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 18, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.