U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fohmann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 21, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • April 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • April 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.