U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sayles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2021: [Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.