U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • June 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 19, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 19, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 11, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time re: Other]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.