U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saffran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • March 02, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Service by Publication]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 12, 2021: [Continue Other]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue Other]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.