U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Judgment ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Bond Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 02, 2021: [Release Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 18, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 25, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.