U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:08-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MacCarter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order of Garnishment]
  • March 23, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 23, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.