U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Service by Publication]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 23, 2021: [Factual Basis]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 26, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.