U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prioleau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Seal]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 04, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 03, 2021: [Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • April 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Appeal Disposition Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 12, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Appeal Disposition Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 23, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court]
  • February 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.