U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • March 26, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.