U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reeves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 15, 2022: [Seal]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 01, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Insanity Defense]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.