U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thrower
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • February 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • February 22, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • February 19, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 18, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 18, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • February 17, 2021: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.