U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jiles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.