U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leary, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice-other]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 26, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • September 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • May 12, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 12, 2022: [USM Return Unexecuted]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 27, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2021: [Proposed Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Seal ]
  • October 11, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 23, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • August 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice-other]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 08, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Judgment on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Bond ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 17, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.