U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ventura
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 26, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • March 26, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.