U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mojica
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver/Consent to Accelerated PSI Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 26, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 26, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 04, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 29, 2022: [Case Reopened]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.