U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 26, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.