U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solis-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • November 17, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • November 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 07, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 06, 2022: [Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Indictment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arrest]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.