U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue Other]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.