U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 04, 2021: [Objection]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 21, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 30, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • April 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 19, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 19, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.