U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 05, 2021: [Transcript - Sealed]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • July 13, 2021: [Claim]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 03, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 01, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • February 22, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.