U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cliett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • May 06, 2021: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • May 06, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.