U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • November 19, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 14, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 12, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • November 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 11, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 11, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 11, 2021: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 11, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 04, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 04, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 27, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 26, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 10, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • April 09, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 22, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 19, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • February 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2021: [Bond]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.